MD HB790 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Washington County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on specified residential property owned by specified disabled veterans of active military, naval, or air service; providing for the amount of the property tax credit; requiring specified disabled veterans or surviving spouses to provide specified documents when applying for the property tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016; etc.
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Commissioners
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
Privacy
Property Tax
Real Property
Records
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Veterans
Washington County
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
Privacy
Property Tax
Real Property
Records
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Veterans
Washington County