MD HB793 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study 2-1-1 Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; and requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the use, governance structure, operation, funding, reporting, and accountability of 2-1-1 Maryland to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019.
Title
Task Force to Study 2-1-1 Maryland
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergencies
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Public Health
Public Information
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telephones
Emergencies
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Public Health
Public Information
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telephones