MD HB794 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, a certain employer from taking certain discriminatory actions against or otherwise penalizing a qualifying patient or caregiver based on the individual's status as a qualifying patient or caregiver or, with respect to a certain qualifying patient, a certain drug test result; authorizing certain individuals to file a complaint with the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Cannabis
Caregivers
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Health
Health Occupations
Labor and Industry, Division of
Patients
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Health
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Caregivers
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Health
Health Occupations
Labor and Industry, Division of
Patients
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Health
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment