MD HB795 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a Baltimore City deputy sheriff for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a certain number of weeks; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateSpecial Order until next session (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-01SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {783597/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback