MD HB797 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Court Administrator to collect, maintain, provide certain access to, and, on or before July 1, 2021, and quarterly thereafter, make and publish on a website accessible to the public a report on certain information related to certain warrants of restitution and writs of possession.
Title
State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsors
Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
Del. Melissa Wells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB544 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Data
Electronic Government
Eviction
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Real Property
Reports
Warrants
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Data
Electronic Government
Eviction
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Real Property
Reports
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 13 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0797?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0797f.pdf |