MD HB801 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, in any court proceedings involving a crime against a victim, the court to ensure that the victim is afforded rights provided to victims by law; authorizing a specified victim to file a motion requesting relief within a specified time period; providing that if the court finds that a victim's right to restitution under a specified provision of law was not considered or was improperly denied, the court may enter a judgment of restitution; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Enforcement
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Luiz Simmons [D] |
Del. Veronica Turner [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Victims
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Victims