MD HB801 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the clerk of the court to report to the Motor Vehicle Administration the adjudication of a minor as delinquent or a finding that a minor has committed a delinquent act for a specified highway violation involving the use of an off-highway recreational vehicle; requiring the Administration to suspend the driver's license of a minor for specified time periods if it receives a report from the clerk of the court; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-26) (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-26) (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-26) |
2013-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {930313/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Courts
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Judges
Juvenile Law
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Courts
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Judges
Juvenile Law
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration