MD HB801 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "Baltimore Convention site"; requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City to enter into an agreement to begin in fiscal year 2020 the planning and design of the expansion and renovation of the Baltimore Convention Facility; and specifying that the agreement include provisions allocating two-thirds of the costs for planning and design to the Authority, and one-third of the costs to Baltimore City.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-2) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {694866/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Bonds
Building Permits
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Land Records
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Stadium Authority
Baltimore City
Bonds
Building Permits
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Land Records
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Stadium Authority