MD HB808 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain list of plants considered to be noxious weeds in the State; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to adopt regulations to establish a list of plants considered to be noxious weeds in the State; altering a certain condition under which the Secretary may designate as a noxious weed certain plant species; specifying that certain criminal penalties apply to certain violations; requiring certain administrative penalties to be distributed to a special fund used only for the control and eradication of a noxious weed; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (136-3)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback