MD HB81 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Judicial Ethics Committee as an alternative to the Commission on Judicial Disabilities or another body designated by a specified court, shall administer and implement specified provisions of law that apply to State officials of the Judicial Branch; etc.
Title
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {360116/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Disclosure
Ethics
Judges
Public Officials
Registers of Wills
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Disclosure
Ethics
Judges
Public Officials
Registers of Wills