MD HB81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for the surviving spouses, who are at least 65 years of age, of certain veterans; providing that surviving spouses who are under the age of 65 and have not remarried may continue to receive the tax credit if the surviving spouses qualified for and received the tax credit before June 1, 2019; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {235668/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-18HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback