MD HB810 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a member of a volunteer company in Washington County who is at least 15 years old and is enrolled in the Fire and Rescue Academy Program operated by the Washington County Board of Education is a covered employee for purposes of receiving workers' compensation benefits.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 45-0 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 332 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 45-0 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Age
Education
Education, Boards of
Fire Protection
Volunteers
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Education
Education, Boards of
Fire Protection
Volunteers
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |