MD HB815 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide covered benefits subject to a copayment from imposing a copayment that exceeds 50% of the allowed amount established for the covered benefit; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Limit on Copayments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2011-03-03 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-22 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0815.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0815f.pdf |