MD HB815 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a licensee at the Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area to conduct live racing of Arabian breed horses under specified circumstances.
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {965865/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Cecil County
Committees and Commissions
Fairs
Fees
Horse Industry Board
Horse Racing
Hospitals
Licenses
Racing
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Animals
Cecil County
Committees and Commissions
Fairs
Fees
Horse Industry Board
Horse Racing
Hospitals
Licenses
Racing
Registration
Revenue and Taxes