MD HB815 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting optional membership in the Employees' Pension System to individuals who have not previously been a member of a specified pension and retirement program or who have not had specified previous employment; authorizing an eligible governmental unit that does not satisfy specified requirements to participate in specified State systems to submit a request to participate to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring the Board to consider specified requests and make specified recommendations; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {504161/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Retail Sales
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Retail Sales
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of