MD HB82 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the definition of "complete streets design features" under the Compete Streets Program by adding access to retail stores that provide health food and other necessities, especially in food deserts, as a design feature of the complete streets policy and as a goal of the Program; and providing the Act may not be construed to require the Maryland Department of Transportation to provide staff or operating expenses for the administration of the Complete Streets Program until money is appropriated in the State budget for the Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-19) (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (121-19)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {330818/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback