MD HB822 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of the term "court" to include an orphans' court or a court exercising the jurisdiction of an orphans' court for the purposes of the Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Orphans' Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-26 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-25 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-25 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-29 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2012-03-19 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2012-03-28 Returned Passed
2012-03-18 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2012-03-17 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-17 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-19 Favorable Report by Judiciary
2012-02-09 Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-09 First Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback