MD HB822 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an employee or a former employee of the City of Hyattsville and a surviving spouse or dependent child of the employee or former employee to enroll and participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program under specified circumstances; authorizing the State to charge the City of Hyattsville and specified entities specified costs resulting from specified individuals participating in the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239
2014-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2014-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2014-04-02SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-19SenateRereferred to Finance
2014-03-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2014-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2014-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-11HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-10HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2014-03-04HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback