MD HB822 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering references to the term "mentally defective" individual to "substantially cognitively impaired" individual in provisions of law concerning specified sexual offenses and in provisions of law concerning the licensing of specified individuals to engage in business as an explosives manufacturer or dealer or to possess explosives for specified purposes.
Title
Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired Individual
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Developmental Disabilities
Explosives
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Mental Health
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Dealers
Developmental Disabilities
Explosives
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Mental Health
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses