MD HB822 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering eligibility for and increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified qualifying police auxiliaries and reserve volunteers for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155
2017-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2017-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {435467/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2017-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0822?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0822f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0822t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_155_hb0822t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0822_43546701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0822.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0822_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0822_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0822,h-0598&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0822,s-1152&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback