MD HB822 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a constituent institution of the University System of Maryland to remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee who is not on probation only for cause, on written charges and in accordance with certain provisions of law; and clarifying that the University System of Maryland may not remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee for any reason prohibited by State antidiscrimination law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-33) (Y: 104 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-42) (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (104-33)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {837572/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (95-42)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {214462/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0822?ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0822f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0822t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0822e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_697_hb0822e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0822_21446201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0822_83757201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0822.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0822_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0515.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0822_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1038.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1205.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback