MD HB827 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement officer who suspects that a child that has been detained is a victim of sex trafficking to notify a regional navigator; requiring a local department of social services that receives a report of suspected child abuse or neglect to refer the child to a regional navigator for services; establishing the Safe Harbor Regional Navigator Grant Program to support services for youth victims of sex trafficking; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide funding by October 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Lee) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {592618/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Family Law
Grants
Human Services, Department of
Human Trafficking
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Victims
Youth
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Family Law
Grants
Human Services, Department of
Human Trafficking
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Victims
Youth