MD HB829 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a carrier from rejecting a provider who provides community-based health services for an accredited program solely because the provider is a licensed graduate social worker, licensed master social worker, licensed graduate alcohol and drug counselor, licensed graduate marriage and family therapist, licensed graduate professional art therapist, or licensed graduate professional counselor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Graduate Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {323429/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {906688/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0829&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0829f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0829t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_551_hb0829t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0829_32342901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0829_90668801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0829.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0829_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0589.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0829_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1023.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback