MD HB832 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from denying an individual access to a home- and community-based services waiver due to a lack of funding for waiver services if the individual is living at home or in the community at a certain time, received certain services, will be or has been terminated from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program due to certain entitlement or enrollment, meets certain eligibility criteria, and certain services received by the individual would qualify for federal matching funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {516780/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-25HouseHearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback