MD HB835 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to develop a list of any federal or State incentive programs available to an employer who hires and trains formerly incarcerated individuals; and requiring the Department to make the list available on the main page of the Department's website.
Title
Labor and Employment - Incentive Programs for Hiring and Retraining - List
Sponsors
Del. Dalya Attar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 336 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Communication
Ex-Offenders
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Prisoners
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Work, Labor and Employment
Electronic Communication
Ex-Offenders
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Prisoners
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |