MD HB837 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purposes of the Cultural and Linguistic Health Care Professional Competency Program; requiring the Program to establish and provide an evidence-based implicit bias training program for health care professionals involved in the perinatal care of patients on or before January 1, 2021; requiring certain health care professionals to complete a certain training on or before January 1, 2022; requiring the Program to offer a certain training to certain health care professionals; etc.
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality and Morbidity - Implicit Bias Training and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 337 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {186380/1 Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Death
Demographics
Discrimination
Ethics
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Patients
Pregnancy
Public Health
Reports
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Death
Demographics
Discrimination
Ethics
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Patients
Pregnancy
Public Health
Reports
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |