MD HB839 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Central Home Detention Unit of the Division of Parole and Probation; authorizing the Director of the Division of Parole and Probation to authorize certain employees of the Central Home Detention Unit to exercise certain powers, including executing warrants for the retaking or arrest of certain offenders and executing search warrants; requiring an employee of the Central Home Detention Unit to meet certain minimum qualifications and training of the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; etc.
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsors
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Gabriel Acevero [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] | Sen. Paul Corderman [R] |
Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Collective Bargaining
Home Detention
Law Enforcement
Parole and Probation
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Employees
Public Safety
Search and Seizure
Warrants
Collective Bargaining
Home Detention
Law Enforcement
Parole and Probation
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Employees
Public Safety
Search and Seizure
Warrants