MD HB84 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale certain child care products containing one-tenth of 1% of certain flame-retardant chemicals and intended for use by a child under the age of 12 years; authorizing the Secretary of Health to suspend implementation of certain provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a certain determination; altering the date by which the Maryland Department of Health is required to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Child Care
Consumer Protection
Fire Protection
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Consumer Protection
Fire Protection
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety