MD HB84 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an original equipment manufacturer to make available, on fair and reasonable terms, certain materials or updates to an independent repair provider or owner of digital electronic equipment; providing that a violation of certain provisions of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice and subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsors
Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Marc Korman [D] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] | Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB412 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-15 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Industry and Technology
internet
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Trade Secrets
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Industry and Technology
internet
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Trade Secrets
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |