MD HB844 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each local school system in the State to submit an interim report on the ratio of students to psychologists in each school, strategies to increase the number of psychologists, policies to decrease wait times, and strategies to increase retention of qualified psychologists to the State Board of Education, the Governor, and certain legislative committees by July 1, 2020; requiring each local school system in the State to submit a final report on school psychologists to the State Board by December 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSpecial Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable
2019-03-28SenateSpecial Order until 4/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {695069/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback