MD HB853 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program established by a county or municipality to include loans to certain residential and commercial property owners to finance certain grid resilience projects; and requiring a certain ordinance or resolution that establishes a certain clean energy loan program to include certain eligibility requirements for certain grid resilience projects.
Title
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273691/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commercial Property
Counties
Counties - Generally
Energy
Energy Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Renewable Energy Sources
Counties
Counties - Generally
Energy
Energy Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Renewable Energy Sources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |