MD HB854 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception to the requirements of the Forest Conservation Act for stormwater management activity performed by a local jurisdiction.
Title
Forest Conservation Act - Exception for Local Stormwater Management Activity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0854.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0854f.pdf |