MD HB86 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from 18 to 36 months, under certain circumstances, the period of time for which certain group contracts are required to provide continuation coverage for insureds who have experienced a change in status as the result of termination of employment other than for cause; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020.
Title
Health Insurance - Continuation Coverage - Change in Employment Status
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |