MD HB863 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adjust a certain reduction of a retiree's accidental or special disability retirement benefit to reflect any offset awarded to the retiree's employer by the Workers' Compensation Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback