MD HB87 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Fire Marshal to administer and enforce specified provisions of law that regulate nongovernmental electrical inspectors; requiring a utility to receive a cut-in certificate under specified circumstances; requiring an electrical installation to obtain a specified certification within 15 days after completion; providing exemptions for specified electrical installations; etc.
Title
State Fire Marshal - Nongovernmental Electrical Inspectors
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing 1/21 at 10:30 a.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2009-11-02 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appeals
Counties
Electricians
Examinations
Fees
Fire Protection
Hearings
Inspections
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Counties
Electricians
Examinations
Fees
Fire Protection
Hearings
Inspections
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Utilities