MD HB87 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified income of specified individuals from the discharge of student loan debt under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to submit specified documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan Debt
Sponsors
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
Del. Jay Walker [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105669/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-01-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |