MD HB87 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $100 to $7,500 the amount of compensation of the nonstudent members of the Baltimore County Board of Education; increasing from $100 to $1,000 the amount a student member of the Board is granted for a scholarship toward the student's higher education costs; and providing that the Act does not apply to the compensation of the nonstudent members or the scholarship amount for student members of the county board during a term of office beginning before the effective date of the Act.
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education – Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-10) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-10) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {305061/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |