MD HB87 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the membership of the State Board of Education to add a certified teacher who is actively teaching and a parent of a student enrolled in a public school in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a teacher member with the advice and consent of the Senate who received the highest number of votes after an election by teachers in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a certain parent member with the advice and consent of the Senate from a certain list submitted by the Maryland PTA; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-37) (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {933823/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (41-95) (Y: 42 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {273728/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-97) (Y: 41 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (98-37)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {444133/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed (98-40)
2019-02-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-13HouseFloor Amendment {273728/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-97)
2019-02-13HouseFloor Amendment {933823/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (41-95)
2019-02-12HouseSpecial Order until 02/13 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-02-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {245161/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0087&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0087f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0087t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0087e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0087_24516101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0087_27372801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0087_93382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0087_44413301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0087.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0087_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0061.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0062.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0099.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0087_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1053.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1214.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback