MD HB871 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to make a one-time transfer of up to $25,000,000 from the non-State supported fund balance to a quasi-endowment fund; limiting the use of certain proceeds to certain purposes; and stating the intent of the General Assembly for the source of a certain transfer.
Title
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {764565/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Investments
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Higher Education
Investments
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges