MD HB874 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Oversight Committee on Monitoring and Quality of Care in Group Homes; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Oversight Committee; providing that a member of the Oversight Committee may not receive compensation but may be reimbursed for specified expenses; requiring the Oversight Committee to evaluate the progress in improving the monitoring and quality of care in group homes and develop recommendations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oversight Committee on Monitoring and Quality of Care in Group Homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
2010-03-03 Hearing cancelled
2010-02-24 Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-10 First Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback