MD HB874 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date by which the Task Force to Study Access of Individuals with Mental Illness to Regulated Firearms is required to submit its findings and recommendations to December 1, 2013; and extending to June 30, 2014, the termination date of the Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Access of Individuals with Mental Illness to Regulated Firearms - Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-8) (Y: 121 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2013-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (121-8)
2013-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2013-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2013-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2013-02-26HouseHearing cancelled
2013-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2013-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback