MD HB874 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of a county to establish a specified process for making a recommendation to the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene for the appointment of a health officer; providing for the confidentiality of specified information; providing that specified meetings are closed; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Health Officers - Authority of County Governing Body and Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619
2014-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2014-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2014-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2014-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {796284/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-03-04HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0874&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0874f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0874t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_619_hb0874t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0874_79628401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0874.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0874_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0874_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0874,h-0631&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0874,s-1036&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback