MD HB874 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating an exemption under the Forest Conservation Act for the cutting or clearing of trees to comply with a specified provision of law relating to obstructions to air navigation; and providing that the exemption does not apply to the cutting or clearing of trees to facilitate the expansion or extension of the boundaries of any airport or runway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-0) (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464
2017-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-10SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (122-0)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {540314/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0874&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0874f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0874t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_464_hb0874t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0874_54031401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0874.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0874_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0874_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0874,h-0719&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0874,s-1441&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback