MD HB874 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Executive Director of the Department of Legislative Services to ensure that the responsibilities of the Department are carried out; altering the offices that comprise the Department; requiring the Executive Director, with the approval of and in consultation with certain individuals, to appoint certain office directors; altering certain duties of the Department to review certain reporting requirements; establishing the Office of Operations and Support Services to directly supervise certain support services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281
2018-03-20HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-16SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Senate Rules
2018-03-15SenateHearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFloor Amendment {583826/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {203826/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0874&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0874f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0874t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_281_hb0874t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0874_20382601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0874_58382601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0874.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0874_exn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0264.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0874_sru.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0716.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback