MD HB876 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to single parent services programs.
Title
Family Law - Single Parent Services - Repeal
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Judiciary |