MD HB876 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to implement, by law, a specified property tax credit that may not exceed a specified amount under specified circumstances; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to adopt specified requirements and procedures to carry out a specified program; requiring a specified value to be determined by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring a specified value to be determined by specified professional appraisers; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194 |
2014-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appraisals
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Historical Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Historical Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property