MD HB876 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified fertility preservation procedures; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2018.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assessments
Chemical Tests
Contracts
Drugs
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Reproductive Matters
Storage
Chemical Tests
Contracts
Drugs
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Reproductive Matters
Storage