MD HB878 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the fees that are due for failure to file a campaign finance report, an affidavit, or an amended campaign finance report; increasing the maximum fee payable for a campaign finance report, an affidavit, or an amended campaign finance report from $500 to $1,000; prohibiting an individual from being issued a certificate of nomination if, on or before the deadline for declining the nomination, the candidate has failed to file a certain campaign finance document or pay a late filing fee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Campaign Finance Reports - Late Fees and Certificates of Nomination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-10) (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (43-2)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (127-10)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {695267/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback