MD HB88 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under certain circumstances or possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under certain circumstances; establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties to review penalites for violations in the Maryland Code and make recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme throughout the Code; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-12) (Y: 124 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-17) (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (124-12)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {443225/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (122-17)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseReassigned to Economic Matters
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0088&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0088f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0088t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0088e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_578_hb0088e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0088_44322501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0088.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0088_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0662.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0088_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1275.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1587.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback