MD HB88 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from retaliating against, penalizing, or punishing a police officer because the police officer has sought or received mental health services.
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Prohibition Against Penalization for Seeking Mental Health Services
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Carl Jackson [D] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {862918/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB74 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Subjects
Counselors
Death
Injury
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privacy
Protests and Demonstrations
Public Safety
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Death
Injury
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privacy
Protests and Demonstrations
Public Safety
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |